|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) (Uncertain) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1894 | To Service | To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 752 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3623 |
||
06/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5752 | ||
02/1935 | Modification | Modification: Converted to N5/2 | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9290 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Wrexham Rhosddu (WRX) | ||
07/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69290 | ||
21/09/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B) | ||
19/07/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
13/12/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
02/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69290 |