Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 371 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6155 Week
» 27544 Month
» 147071 Year
» 3173924 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
751 |
m/e |
10/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5751 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9289 |
on |
27/01/1946 |
British Railways |
69289 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3622 |
To Service |
During 10/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 20/02/1954 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 4 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1894 |
BID |
|
Bidston |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
6E |
|
Wrexham Rhosddu |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/02/1954 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
16/01/1954 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1931 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 751 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3622 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5751 |
|
|
09/1931 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
27/01/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9289 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bidston (BID) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69289 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69289 |
|
|