Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 604 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6388 Week
» 27777 Month
» 147304 Year
» 3174157 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
750 |
m/e |
10/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5750 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9288 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69288 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3621 |
To Service |
During 10/1894 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 23/04/1955 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 6 mths , 24 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1894 |
LIV |
|
Brunswick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
6E |
|
Wrexham Rhosddu |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
23/04/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
23/04/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1937 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
22/03/1948 |
Gorton Works |
On 22/3 the following locomotives were observed renumbered: in the Erecting Shop Nos. 63765, 64302, 65197 an 69326, while outside the Erecting Shop were Nos. 62664 an 64407. Also recently ex works were Nos. E3243 and E9288, which apparently are the last locomotives to leave Gorton Works, bearing the short-lived prefix E. |
SLS/194805 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 750 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3621 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5750 |
|
|
03/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9288 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Brunswick (LIV) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69288 |
|
|
04/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wrexham Rhosddu (6E) |
|
|
23/04/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69288 |
|
|