Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1419 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19222 Week
» 72238 Month
» 191765 Year
» 3218618 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
749 |
m/e |
09/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5749 |
m/e |
07/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9287 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69287 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3620 |
To Service |
During 09/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 11/07/1955 |
Service Life |
60 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
28/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
11/07/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1928 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 749 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3620 |
|
|
07/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5749 |
|
|
12/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9287 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tuxford (TUX) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69287 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
19/12/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
11/07/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69287 |
|
|