Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 159 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17962 Week
» 70978 Month
» 190505 Year
» 3217358 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
748 |
m/e |
09/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5748 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9286 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69286 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3619 |
To Service |
During 09/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 26/11/1960 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
04/1928 |
Converted to N5/2 |
10/1935 |
Reverted to Class N5/1 |
07/1937 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 748 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3619 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5748 |
|
|
04/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
10/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Reverted to Class N5/1 |
|
|
07/1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9286 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (ANN) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69286 |
|
|
30/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) |
|
|
21/11/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
17/12/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
18/04/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
26/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69286 |
|
|