Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1003 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6787 Week
» 28176 Month
» 147703 Year
» 3174556 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
747 |
m/e |
09/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5747 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9285 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69285 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3618 |
To Service |
During 09/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/11/1955 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 747 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3618 |
|
|
02/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5747 |
|
|
12/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9285 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barnsley (BRN) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69285 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
21/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69285 |
|
|