Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 341 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6125 Week
» 27514 Month
» 147041 Year
» 3173894 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
746 |
m/e |
08/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5746 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9284 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69284 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3617 |
To Service |
During 08/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 03/08/1958 |
Service Life |
64 yrs , 3 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40F |
Boston |
4w/e |
18/08/1956 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Langwith Junction |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/02/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1930 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 746 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3617 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5746 |
|
|
12/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9284 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Langwith Junction (LNG) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69284 |
|
|
25/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Boston (40F) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E) |
|
|
03/08/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69284 |
|
|