Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 611 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6395 Week
» 27784 Month
» 147311 Year
» 3174164 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
543 |
m/e |
03/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5543 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9276 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69276 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3576 |
To Service |
During 03/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 22/12/1959 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 9 mths , 23 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1894 |
STP |
|
Heaton Mersey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34E |
|
New England |
4w/e |
10/05/1958 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
22/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
26/07/1958 |
Essendine-Stamford |
On 26th July this branch was being worked by N5 69276 recently transferred from Trafford Park to New England in place of GN C12 4-4-2T here. |
SLS/195808 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 543 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3576 |
|
|
08/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5543 |
|
|
02/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9276 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Heaton Mersey (STP) |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69276 |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
22/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69276 |
|
|