Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
542 |
m/e |
02/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5542 |
m/e |
06/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9275 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69275 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3575 |
To Service |
During 02/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 19/11/1955 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 9 mths , 19 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1894 |
TUX |
|
Tuxford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
19/11/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
19/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1935 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
11/10/1955 |
York |
An unusual visitor to York in October was 73051 (71G) which worked the 4.15 p.m. stopping passenger train from York to Sheffield (Midland) on 11/10/55. (This is normally a Saltley or Bournville Stanier Class 5 turn.) On 19/10/55 ex-works (Darlington) B1s at York shed were 61110 (37A) and 61229 (37C). On 7/11/55 42860 (26B) worked the 10.10 a.m. York to Manchester (Victoria) and 5.10 p.m. Manchester (Victoria) to York instead of the usual York B1. N5 No. 69357 (36B) was in York shed on 9/11/55, and on 15/11/55 A7 No. 69785 (53C) was in the shed yard en route for Darlington works. On 17/11/55 York had quite a Great Central appearance with 69275 (40A) in the shed and 69256 (40F), 69278 (36D), 69303 (36D), and 69310 (38A) in the shed yard, all in steam, and some marked in chalk 'For Darlington plant'. Another most unusual visitor, both as regards type and shed, on the same day was 7F 0-8-0 49648 (25E). |
SLS/195512 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 542 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3575 |
|
|
06/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5542 |
|
|
06/1935 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9275 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tuxford (TUX) |
|
|
17/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69275 |
|
|
19/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69275 |
|
|