|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1894 | To Service | To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 540 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3573 |
||
07/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5540 | ||
10/1930 | Modification | Modification: Converted to N5/2 | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9273 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) | ||
17/04/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX) | ||
01/05/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (RET) | ||
05/1952 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69273 | ||
27/12/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
17/01/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neasden (34E) | ||
27/06/1955 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69273 |