|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/03/1952 | Locomotives still carrying old numbers (LNER) | Engines running with L.N.E. Numbers. (March 1952) 1423, 1879, 2364, 2372, 2395, 2620, 2654, 2659, 3573, 3585, 3647, 3913, 4114, 4117, 4140, 4368, 4642, 5177, 5213, 5297, 5331, 5343, 5565, 7461, 7465, 7470, 7471, 7488, 7500, 7604, 7606, 7625, 8000/1, 8091/6, 8103/8/9/10/21/24/30/31/34-38, 8142/3/5/9, 8154/7, 8161/8, 8173/6/7/8, 8249, 8298, 8316, 8343/54, 8405/94, 8504/14/25/68, 8619/64, 8788/95, 8915/74/79, 9143, 9271/73, 9322, 9707. Uncertain: 851, 6480/1, 9290, 9920 (? done and not reported). | SLS/195206 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1894 | To Service | To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 537 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3570 |
||
09/1924 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5537 | ||
04/1933 | Modification | Modification: Converted to N5/2 | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9271 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) | ||
24/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) | ||
03/1953 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69271 | ||
16/05/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
17/12/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
03/08/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69271 |