Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4262 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17668 Week
» 70684 Month
» 190211 Year
» 3217064 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
535 |
m/e |
01/1894 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5535 |
m/e |
10/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9268 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69268 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3569 |
To Service |
During 01/1894 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 26/01/1960 |
Service Life |
66 yrs , 26 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1894 |
BRN |
|
Barnsley |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
41J |
|
Langwith Junction |
w/e |
17/10/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/01/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
41J |
Langwith Junction |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
26/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
07/1930 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1894 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 535 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3569 |
|
|
10/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5535 |
|
|
07/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9268 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Barnsley (BRN) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69268 |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) |
|
|
26/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69268 |
|
|