Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 1051 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6835 Week
» 28224 Month
» 147751 Year
» 3174604 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
533 |
m/e |
12/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5533 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9266 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69266 |
m/e |
09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3567 |
To Service |
During 12/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 25/11/1960 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1934 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 533 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3567 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5533 |
|
|
03/1934 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9266 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69266 |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
06/09/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
13/12/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E) |
|
|
01/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
03/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
25/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69266 |
|
|