|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1946 | General | At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock | SLS/194701 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/1893 | To Service | To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 529 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3563 |
||
10/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 5529 | ||
01/1932 | Modification | Modification: Converted to N5/2 | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9263 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) | ||
25/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
07/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD) | ||
04/11/1950 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69263 | ||
19/12/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
13/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D) | ||
31/10/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (41J) | ||
17/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69263 |