Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 687 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6471 Week
» 27860 Month
» 147387 Year
» 3174240 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
525 |
m/e |
10/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5525 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9259 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69259 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3559 |
To Service |
During 10/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 14/11/1958 |
Service Life |
65 yrs, 1 mth , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1893 |
NEA |
|
Neasden |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
39B |
|
Sheffield Darnall |
6w/e |
25/12/1954 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
14/11/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
01/01/1955 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
14/11/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1930 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 525 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3559 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5525 |
|
|
12/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9259 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69259 |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
14/11/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69259 |
|
|