Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1156 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 6940 Week
» 28329 Month
» 147856 Year
» 3174709 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
523 |
m/e |
10/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5523 |
m/e |
12/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9257 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69257 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3557 |
To Service |
During 10/1893 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/12/1959 |
Service Life |
66 yrs, 2 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
34E |
Neasden |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
30A |
Stratford |
4w/e |
18/09/1954 |
ALLOC |
34E |
Neasden |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
LOAN |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
01/02/1958 |
ALLOC |
14D |
Neasden |
on |
23/02/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1932 |
Converted to N5/2 |
04/1942 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 523 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3557 |
|
|
12/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5523 |
|
|
09/1932 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
04/1942 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9257 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69257 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
22/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
22/08/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Annesley (38B) |
|
|
19/09/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (34E) |
|
|
12/12/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69257 |
|
|