Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1499 Today
» 5784 Yesterday
» 7283 Week
» 28672 Month
» 148199 Year
» 3175052 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway |
518 |
m/e |
08/1893 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
5518 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9253 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
69253 |
m/e |
03/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Parker |
Class |
N5 |
Company History |
MLSR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Beyer Peacock Ltd. |
Works Number |
3552 |
To Service |
During 08/1893 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 05/11/1955 |
Service Life |
62 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
w/e |
21/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
39B |
Sheffield Darnall |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
05/11/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1936 |
Converted to N5/2 |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1893 |
To Service |
To service as Manchester, Sheffield and Lincolnshire Railway Number 518 Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3552 |
|
|
04/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 5518 |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
03/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Converted to N5/2 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9253 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD) |
|
|
03/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69253 |
|
|
21/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
31/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (39B) |
|
|
05/11/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69253 |
|
|