Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1079 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18882 Week
» 71898 Month
» 191425 Year
» 3218278 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1755 |
m/e |
03/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4755 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9534 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69534 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22611 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 03/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 09/02/1959 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34A |
Kings Cross |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
ALLOC |
34C |
Hatfield |
4w/e |
20/02/1954 |
ALLOC |
34B |
Hornsey |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/02/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
12/1946 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1755 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22611 |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4755 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9534 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69534 |
|
|
23/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
20/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (34C) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
09/02/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69534 |
|
|