Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 791 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14197 Week
» 67213 Month
» 186740 Year
» 3213593 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1753 |
m/e |
03/1921 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4753 |
m/e |
05/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9532 |
on |
16/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69532 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22609 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 03/1921 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 02/06/1959 |
Service Life |
38 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
03/1921 |
KX |
|
Kings Cross |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
02/06/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KX |
Kings Cross |
on |
03/06/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
02/06/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1947 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1921 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1753 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22609 |
|
|
05/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4753 |
|
|
16/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9532 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69532 |
|
|
02/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69532 |
|
|