Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 725 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18528 Week
» 71544 Month
» 191071 Year
» 3217924 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1726 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4726 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9505 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69505 |
m/e |
04/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22582 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Thu 10/11/1960 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 11 mths , 11 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1920 |
HSY |
|
Hornsey |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
34F |
|
Grantham |
w/e |
20/06/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
10/11/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
34F |
Grantham |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/11/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1927 |
Condensers removed |
01/1928 |
Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
03/1939 |
Vacuum |
02/1947 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/03/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives entering Works during March: These included Nos. 60020/43/54, 60133/41, 60512/39, 60820/65/67, 61083, 61634, 61822/24/61, 61947/85, 67713/24, 69444, 69505. A considerable number of 'Pacific' and 'V.2' Class locomotives are being fitted with A.T.C. gear, as part of the ex-G.N. main line has already been equipped with A.T.C. apparatus; this may be extended. |
SLS/195005 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1726 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22582 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4726 |
|
|
08/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
01/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
|
|
03/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9505 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
04/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69505 |
|
|
20/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (34F) |
|
|
10/11/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69505 |
|
|