Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3045 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16451 Week
» 69467 Month
» 188994 Year
» 3215847 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1723 |
m/e |
12/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4723 |
m/e |
03/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9502 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
69502 |
m/e |
08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
N2 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L734 |
Works Number |
22579 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Vacuum |
|
To Service |
During 12/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 12/05/1958 |
Service Life |
37 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
09/1927 |
Condensers removed |
03/1928 |
Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
03/1939 |
Vacuum |
08/1944 |
Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1723 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22579 |
|
|
03/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4723 |
|
|
09/1927 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
03/1928 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum and Westinghouse Brake |
|
|
03/1939 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum |
|
|
08/1944 |
Modification |
Modification: Robinson pattern superheater fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9502 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
28/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69502 |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Grantham (35B) |
|
|
15/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
23/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
17/11/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
18/05/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hornsey (34B) |
|
|
12/05/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69502 |
|
|