Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 888 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14294 Week
» 67310 Month
» 186837 Year
» 3213690 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1604 |
m/e |
06/1912 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4604 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9484 |
m/e |
07/1946 |
British Railways |
69484 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
268 |
Works Number |
1349 |
To Service |
During 06/1912 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 30/09/1957 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
HAT |
Hatfield |
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
ALLOC |
37A |
Ardsley |
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/09/1957 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1912 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1604 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1349 |
|
|
09/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4604 |
|
|
07/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9484 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX) |
|
|
12/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hatfield (HAT) |
|
|
09/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69484 |
|
|
29/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ardsley (37A) |
|
|
30/09/1957 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69484 |
|
|