Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 72 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1199 Week
» 12492 Month
» 277125 Year
» 1498690 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1595 m/e 05/1912
LNER (1924) 4595 m/e 03/1925
LNER (1946) 9475 on 17/03/1946
BR 69475 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1340
To Service During 05/1912
Withdrawal Mon 11/04/1955
Service Life 42 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 05/1912
HSY Hornsey on 01/01/1948
37C Bradford Hammerton Street 5w/e 21/03/1953
34C Hatfield 4w/e 21/08/1954
37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 19/03/1955
   Withdrawn on 11/04/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 34A Kings Cross 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 26/03/1955
WDN   on 11/04/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1595
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1340
   
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4595    
17/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9475    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69475    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
21/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
19/03/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
11/04/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69475    

prev prev