Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1227 Week
» 12520 Month
» 277153 Year
» 1498718 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1584 m/e 02/1912
LNER (1924) 4584 m/e 03/1924
LNER (1946) 9464 m/e 10/1946
BR 69464 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 267
Works Number 1329
To Service During 02/1912
Withdrawal Mon 08/08/1955
Service Life 43 yrs, 6 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1912
BFD Bradford Hammerton Street on 01/01/1948
   Withdrawn on 08/08/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 08/08/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
10/05/1947 Doncaster Works Locos. ex Plant, end April-May were: Nos. 16, 41, 51, 63, 86, 90, 101, 102, 113, 521, 863, 878, 890, 942, 1808, 1832, 1919, 1961, 2169, 3031, 3505, 3950, 3986, 5021, 7391, 8786 and 9492. Further locos. ex Plant include Nos. 29 (4/6) and 1949, 8784, 9464 (5/6). SLS/194708
24/08/1947 Eastfield MPD On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1912 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1584
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1329
   
03/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 4584    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9464    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bradford Hammerton Street (BFD)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69464    
08/08/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69464    

prev prev