Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 100 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1227 Week
» 12520 Month
» 277153 Year
» 1498718 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1576 m/e 12/1910
LNER (1924) 4576 m/e 05/1925
LNER (1946) 9456 m/e 09/1946
BR 69456 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 264
Works Number 1291
To Service During 12/1910
Withdrawal w/e Mon 15/11/1954
Service Life 43 yrs, 11 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1910
HSY Hornsey on 01/01/1948
37A Ardsley 4w/e 16/05/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 15/11/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STM St Margarets on 30/04/1947
ALLOC 37A Ardsley 4w/e 16/05/1953
WDN   w/e 15/11/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1910 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1576
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1291
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 4576    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9456    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69456    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (37A)    
15/11/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69456    

prev prev