Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1000 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14406 Week
» 67422 Month
» 186949 Year
» 3213802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1570 |
m/e |
05/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4570 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9450 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
69450 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Ivatt |
Class |
N1 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
261 |
Works Number |
1265 |
To Service |
During 05/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 10/03/1959 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
37B |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
w/e |
30/06/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
10/03/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1570 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1265 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4570 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9450 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69450 |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (37B) |
|
|
10/03/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69450 |
|
|