Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 86 Today
» 1127 Yesterday
» 1213 Week
» 12506 Month
» 277139 Year
» 1498704 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GNR 1552 m/e 12/1907
LNER (1924) 4552 m/e 01/1926
LNER (1946) 9432 m/e 09/1946
BR 69432 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Ivatt
Class N1
Company History GNR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 254
Works Number 1177
To Service During 12/1907
Withdrawal w/e Mon 08/11/1954
Service Life 46 yrs, 11 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1907
HSY Hornsey on 01/01/1948
37C Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 21/07/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 08/11/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 37C Bradford Hammerton Street w/e 30/06/1951
WDN   w/e 08/11/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1907 To Service To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1552
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1177
   
01/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 4552    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9432    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hornsey (HSY)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69432    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (37C)    
08/11/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69432    

prev prev