|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 19/08/1947 | 25/08/1947 | 7 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/01/1949 | 29/01/1949 | 16 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61997 |
||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1949 | 30/01/1950 | 32 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 30/12/1950 | 17/01/1951 | 19 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/10/1951 | 06/11/1951 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/04/1952 | 10/04/1952 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/01/1953 | 03/02/1953 | 33 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/08/1954 | 07/10/1954 | 38 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/05/1956 | 01/06/1956 | 26 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/04/1957 | 01/05/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 02/10/1957 | 05/10/1957 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/11/1957 | 21/11/1957 | 3 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/04/1958 | 17/05/1958 | 31 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 10/11/1958 | 09/12/1958 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/04/1961 | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/12/1945 | G.N. Section | K1 3445 is working from New England, and K2 4639 has moved to Scotland in replacement of her. The name 'Mac Cailin Mor' must have, caused some mystification on the G.N.! | SLS/194602 |
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
30/06/1961 | K1/1 condemned | The solitary Gresley rebuilt Thompson K1/1 2-6-0 loco. 61997 of Fort William (63B) was condemned in June. The loco. was constructed at Darlington Works as 3-Cyl. Class K4 L.N.E.R. 3445 MacCailin Mor in January, 1939, bearing Works No. 1783, and was rebuilt to Class K1/1 with 2-Cyls. at Doncaster Works during November, 1945. It was renumbered 1997 in December, 1946, and B.R. 61997 in January, 1949. The present Class K1 2-6-0s are the Peppercorn development of Class K1/1 for new construction, with increased length and other detail modifications. | SLS/196109 |
02/07/1961 | Doncaster Works (Scrap Yard) | New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196108 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1939 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3445, name: MACCAILIN MÓR Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1783 |
||
02/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
16/05/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Blaydon (BLA) | ||
05/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
06/07/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
24/08/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
01/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (THJ) | ||
30/09/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
29/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
01/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1997 | ||
19/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/08/1947. Dep: 25/08/1947. | ||
15/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
14/01/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 14/01/1949. Dep: 29/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61997 |
||
13/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
19/11/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
30/12/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 30/12/1949. Dep: 30/01/1950. | ||
30/12/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/12/1950. Dep: 17/01/1951. | ||
08/10/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 08/10/1951. Dep: 06/11/1951. | ||
09/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 09/04/1952. Dep: 10/04/1952. | ||
02/01/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 02/01/1953. Dep: 03/02/1953. | ||
24/05/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fort William (63D) | ||
31/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/08/1954. Dep: 07/10/1954. | ||
07/05/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/05/1956. Dep: 01/06/1956. | ||
29/04/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/04/1957. Dep: 01/05/1957. | ||
02/10/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 02/10/1957. Dep: 05/10/1957. | ||
19/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 19/11/1957. Dep: 21/11/1957. | ||
17/04/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/04/1958. Dep: 17/05/1958. | ||
10/11/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 10/11/1958. Dep: 09/12/1958. | ||
1961 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
24/04/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 24/04/1961. | ||
12/06/1961 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61997 from Fort William (63B) |