Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1307 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 12522 Week
» 3578 Month
» 350002 Year
» 3376855 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
3813 |
m/e |
11/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1973 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
61973 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1682 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 11/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/11/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs , 4 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1962 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3813 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1682 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1973 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61973 |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
10/01/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (41H) |
|
|
1962 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
04/11/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61973 |
|
|