Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 559 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 11774 Week
» 2830 Month
» 349254 Year
» 3376107 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2429 |
m/e |
05/1936 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1960 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
61960 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Armstrong Whitworth |
Order Number |
L92 |
Works Number |
1271 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 05/1936 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
05/1936 |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
40B |
|
Immingham |
w/e |
15/07/1961 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/09/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
on |
29/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
40B |
Immingham |
4w/e |
05/08/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/09/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1936 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2429 Built at Armstrong Whitworth, Works Number 1271 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1960 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61960 |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61960 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|