Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2552 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15958 Week
» 68974 Month
» 188501 Year
» 3215354 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2428 |
m/e |
08/1935 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1942 |
m/e |
10/1946 |
British Railways |
61942 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Order Number |
L890 |
Works Number |
24228 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 08/1935 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 16/09/1962 |
Service Life |
27 yrs, 1 mth , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1935 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2428 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24228 |
|
|
10/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1942 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61942 |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
30/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
18/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/09/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61942 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|