Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 697 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18500 Week
» 71516 Month
» 191043 Year
» 3217896 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
1332 |
m/e |
09/1934 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1930 |
m/e |
04/1946 |
British Railways |
61930 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Order Number |
E152 |
Works Number |
4076 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1934 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 17/12/1962 |
Service Life |
28 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1963 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52D |
Tweedmouth |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
ALLOC |
52H |
Tyne Dock |
6w/e |
11/11/1961 |
ALLOC |
50B |
Hull Dairycoates |
5w/e |
03/02/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
17/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1934 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 1332 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd, Works Number 4076 |
|
|
04/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1930 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD) |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61930 |
|
|
19/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
26/01/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
14/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tyne Dock (52H) |
|
|
20/01/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61930 |
|
|
1963 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|