11/01/1943 |
LNER Notes |
On 11/1/1943, the 8 a.m. Perth-Edinburgh was hauled by 3401 Bantam Cock, with 9418 Dumbie-dykes as pilot up Glenfarg to Kincross Jc. Two days later 'J.39' 2980 (EFD) worked several locals on the Dundee-Tayport branch. 'K.3's' 1121 and 1106 were noted at Dundee on 30/12 and 3/1 respectively, while a most unusual visitor on 30/12 was 4475 Flying Fox on the 12.40 Aberdeen to Dundee. |
SLS/194302 |
02/12/1946 |
Queens Park Works |
A further nine new 'B.1' Class locos were ex. Queen's Park Works as follows:-1093 1/11, 1094 6/11, 1095 11/11, 1096 13/11, 1097 w/e 16/11, 1098/9 w/e 23/11, 1100 26/11, 1101 w/e 30/11, and 1102 2/12. 1093-1101 carry works numbers 25849-57 (all checked). On the same date 1103 (25863) and 1104 (25864) were in the Paint Shop, whilst in the Erecting Shop were 1105-1109; 1105/6 were completed and the latter undergoing steam test. The other three were in an advanced state of construction. The green engines have the numbers on the cab sides in 'Gill Sans' style, but they and the lettering on the tender are not in pre-war shaded gilt, but in plain yellow, with a thin black line all round, about &nfrac18;' thick! The black engines of the series have yellow letters with red shading |
SLS/194701 |
08/10/1948 |
Doncaster Works |
Locomotives noted ready to leave Works were Nos. 60007, painted garter blue; 60516, green; 61120, black and lined, while 60877, 60961, 61804 an 63479 were plain black. Locomotives awaiting Works included:-Nos. 48, 1121 an 1902 while those under heavy repair included Nos. 8, 18, 19. 37, 78, 98, 513/19, 932/62, 1092, 1107/24, 1869, 2116, 7350 an 9999. Condemned locomotives on the dump were:-Nos. 2126/98 an 4107. Withdrawn 'C.1' Class Nos. 3274 an 3285, fitted with tall chimneys, extra- coal space, etc., were noted supplying steam to the Crimpsall Erecting Shop; it also appeared that Nos. 2821 (3293) and 4419 might also be similarly fitted and soon put to a similar use where required. It is understood that sixteen of the new 'A.1's' are to be built at Doncaster and twenty-three at Darlington. |
SLS/194812 |
02/07/1961 |
Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) |
New Erecting Shop: D2394/5, E3064-9. Boiler Shop: E3070. Stripping Road: D2235, D3446, D3694, 60022, 60502/19, 61195, 61311. 61902/19, 64170, 70018/39. Scrap Yard: 61997 being cut up. Crimpsall: 61157, 61846. Outside Crimpsall: D3660, 61056/87, 76050. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D2402, D3449, D5571/2, D8211, 12124, 13253, 43154, 60009/30/62/73/7, 60142/55/6, 61074, 61167, 61378, 61893, 61906/43, 63928, 70009/23/7/35. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60029, 61231, 61850/65, 68591. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: D5534, 60099, 62059, 63967. Paint Shop: D2393, D6720, D9006, E3062/3, 13252, 60161, 61120. Outside Paint Shop: D351, D5347, D5804, D6719. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. |
SLS/196108 |
16/07/1961 |
Doncaster Works (Stripping Road) |
New Erecting Shop: D2395/6, E3064-9, 13253. Boiler Shop: E3071/2. Stripping Road: D2235, 60044/56/63/94, 60502, 61088, 61803, 61902, 73043. Scrap Road: 61824, 61927/64, 64736, 69531 intact, 68951 just cut up. Crimpsal: 60150, 61204. Outside Crimpsal: 60147, 62015, 70034. Erecting Shop: D3446/9, D3660, D5560/72, D8212, 12124, 60022/30, 60155, 60519, 61055, 61157/95, 61208, 61312/26, 61846, 70009/18/38/9, 76050. Outside Erecting Shop: DEPT7, 60034. Weigh House: Nil. Outside Weigh House: 60029, 61906. Paint Shop: D2234, D2394, D5571, D6722, E3063, 60009/73, 61056, 61378, 61893. Outside Paint Shop: D353, D5806, D9008. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. |
SLS/196109 |