Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 935 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 12150 Week
» 3206 Month
» 349630 Year
» 3376483 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2765 |
m/e |
07/1930 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1894 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61894 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1499 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 07/1930 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 30/10/1961 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 4 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1930 |
CLK |
|
Colwick |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
LIN |
|
Lincoln |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
40E |
|
Colwick |
w/e |
22/10/1960 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
30/10/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ANN |
Annesley |
on |
29/06/1947 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
on |
13/07/1947 |
ALLOC |
LIN |
Lincoln |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
40E |
Colwick |
4w/e |
29/10/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
30/10/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
04/01/1959 |
Doncaster MPD (Ex Wks.) |
On shed, waiting Works-60101 (64B), 60506 (34E), 60118 (56C), 60078 (52A), 61159 (40B). Ex Wks.-60517 (52B), 60137 (52A), 61978 (34E), 70000 (30A), 61894 (40A), 61956 (40B), 60094 (64B), 61212 (36E). Stored-63939/41/2/3/54/6/7/63/4/7/9/77/81/3/4, 64876/981 all in open. Others-60031 (64B), D3646/7 (36C), 92035 (36C), D3621/2, D3481/2, 92172/3/95/2201, 69586 (34C), 48269 (2E), 62017/55/70 (31B), 43060 (40F). |
SLS/195902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1930 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2765 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1499 |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1894 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LIN) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61894 |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
30/10/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61894 |
|
|