Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 845 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18648 Week
» 71664 Month
» 191191 Year
» 3218044 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
206 |
m/e |
09/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1863 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
61863 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1288 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 09/1925 to Gorton (GOR) |
Withdrawal |
Mon 06/06/1960 |
Service Life |
34 yrs, 9 mths , 6 dys |
Information |
Rebuilt by Thompson in 1945 - taken in to Doncaster in February and back to traffic on 16th June. However, it wan't reclassified as class K5 until 13th October 1945. |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1930 |
Steam Reverse Removed |
05/1933 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 206 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1288 Allocated to Gorton (GOR) |
|
|
02/02/1926 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neasden (NEA) |
|
|
31/05/1927 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
18/07/1930 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Copley Hill (Leeds) (COP) |
|
|
20/07/1930 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
11/1930 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Reverse Removed |
|
|
12/06/1931 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
05/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
25/06/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) |
|
|
13/09/1945 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1863 |
|
|
27/10/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
15/01/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) |
|
|
28/02/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
18/04/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
04/05/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
17/05/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (MAR) |
|
|
23/11/1947 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (NWE) |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61863 |
|
|
12/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
01/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
06/06/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61863 |
|
|