Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2960 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16366 Week
» 69382 Month
» 188909 Year
» 3215762 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
195 |
m/e |
04/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1858 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61858 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
1283 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 04/1925 |
Withdrawal |
Wed 26/04/1961 |
Service Life |
36 yrs , 26 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1961 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
04/1925 |
CAR |
|
Carlisle Canal |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
26/04/1961 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
01/07/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
02/1933 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1925 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 195 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1283 |
|
|
02/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1858 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61858 |
|
|
1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
26/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61858 |
|
|