|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/04/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during April: These included Nos. 60529, 61103/72, 61738/68, 61854, 61909/83, 62423, 2430, 62436, 2475, 62479, 3143, 4544, 64593, 64849/54, 4865/68, 64899, 4917, 65921, 7469, 8458, 8550, 9151/62, 69174, 9182, 69553, 90071, 90306, ex-L.M.S. 2835, 42909/18, ex-W.D. 77087, 77107, 77302/99. | SLS/195006 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 184 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1279 |
||
06/1931 | Modification | Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1854 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) | ||
11/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61854 | ||
16/03/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) | ||
14/06/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) | ||
16/09/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) | ||
29/10/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61854 | ||
1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |