|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/05/1961 | Doncaster Works (Outside Erecting Shops) | New Erecting Shop: D2392-4, D3489, E3062-7. Boiler Shop: E3068-70. Stripping Road: D2402, 60007/73, 60119/61, 61327, 61844/93, 61904/85/97, 62059, 63967, 70023. Scrap Road: 63947/58, 64970, 68916/29, 69561 all intact, with 63952 just cut up. Crimpsall: 70027, 73016. Outside Crimpsall: DEPT7, 60065. Erecting Shops: D2026, D2234, D3129/52, D3445, D5534/71, 12124, 13252, 13325, 43088, 43152/5, 60013/24/33/88/99, 60525, 61095, 61190, 61249, 61300/70, 61832, 62051, 63963, 70001/5/35. Outside Erecting Shops: 60017, 61845. Outside Weigh House: 43091, 60137, 62047. Paint Shop: D2390/1, D5698, D6715, D8215, D9004/5, E3056/61, 60038/9, 61122/88, 63938, 76031. Outside Paint Shop: D345/6. Works Shunters: DEPT10/1. | SLS/196107 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1925 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 153 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1270 |
||
11/1932 | Modification | Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted | ||
12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1845 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Immingham (IMM) | ||
12/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 61845 | ||
18/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
24/10/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
04/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) | ||
01/08/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
24/12/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (40E) | ||
01/04/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
16/09/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61845 | ||
1963 | Scrapped | Scrapped |