Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 963 Today
» 2271 Yesterday
» 12178 Week
» 3234 Month
» 349658 Year
» 3376511 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Northern Railway |
1002 |
m/e |
09/1920 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
4002 |
m/e |
01/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
1802 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
61802 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
N. Gresley |
Class |
K3 |
Company History |
GNR/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
290 |
Works Number |
1514 |
Fittings (as built) |
|
To Service |
During 09/1920 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 07/03/1960 |
Service Life |
39 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
IMM |
Immingham |
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
23/06/1956 |
ALLOC |
32C |
Lowestoft |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
ALLOC |
40A |
Lincoln |
4w/e |
08/08/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
07/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1933 |
Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/04/1950 |
Doncaster Works |
Class A.1 named include 60120 Kittiwake, 60133 Pommern, 60141 Abbotsford in, April; other engines through Doncaster Plant included A.1 60122; A.2 60500/12/39; A.3 60039/43/54/94; A.4 60018/20/1/3; V.2 60814/20/32/65/67/80/97, 60912/14; K.3 61802/22/24/46/61/67/77, 61947/69/85; B.17 61634; C.12 67366; K.5 61863 (light repair); B.1 61036/83/95, 61113, 61267. Some exchanges of 'Pacifics' and 'Green Arrows' are afoot on account of A.T.C. trials on the G.N. Section. |
SLS/195006 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1920 |
To Service |
To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1002 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1514 |
|
|
01/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 4002 |
|
|
10/1933 |
Modification |
Modification: Long Travel Valves fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 1802 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
14/08/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (IMM) |
|
|
05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 61802 |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
27/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
04/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
01/08/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) |
|
|
1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 61802 |
|
|