|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 14/05/1924 | 27/09/1924 | 137 days | General | Altered for GE/NB gauge Boiler number 7620 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4704 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1930 | 12/07/1930 | General | Boiler number 7617 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 20/10/1934 | General | Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 17/10/1935 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 22/02/1936 | General | Drop Grate fitted (again?) Boiler number 7547 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 26/05/1937 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 02/09/1938 | General | Cab screens fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 17/06/1939 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 23/03/1940 | General | Boiler number C1826 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 28/09/1940 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 08/11/1941 | General | Boiler number C1828 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 31/10/1942 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 07/12/1942 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 12/08/1944 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 08/02/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 27/10/1945 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/09/1946 | 17/10/1946 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 7619 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 26/06/1947 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/05/1948 | 02/07/1948 | 53 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61794 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 10/03/1949 | 23/04/1949 | 45 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/02/1951 | 19/05/1951 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 21172 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 02/04/1954 | 01/05/1954 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/05/1954 | 26/05/1954 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/02/1955 | 26/03/1955 | 48 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1956 | 01/09/1956 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 21124 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 21/08/1958 | 19/09/1958 | 30 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1704 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5354 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
14/05/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/05/1924. Dep: 27/09/1924. Work undertaken: Altered for GE/NB gauge Boiler number 7620 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4704 |
||
22/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
20/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1930. Dep: 12/07/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7617 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/1933 | Naming | Named 'LOCH OICH' | ||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 20/10/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 17/10/1935. | ||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: 22/02/1936. Work undertaken: Drop Grate fitted (again?) Boiler number 7547 (Diagram 3) |
||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 26/05/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 02/09/1938. Work undertaken: Cab screens fitted |
||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 17/06/1939. | ||
07/01/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 23/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1826 (Diagram 3) |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 28/09/1940. | ||
07/07/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 08/11/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number C1828 (Diagram 3) |
||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 31/10/1942. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 07/12/1942. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 12/08/1944. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 27/10/1945. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 08/02/1945. | ||
13/01/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1794 | ||
15/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/09/1946. Dep: 17/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7619 (Diagram 3) |
||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 26/06/1947. | ||
11/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 11/05/1948. Dep: 02/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61794 |
||
10/03/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 10/03/1949. Dep: 23/04/1949. | ||
22/02/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1951. Dep: 19/05/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21172 (Diagram 3) |
||
02/04/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 02/04/1954. Dep: 01/05/1954. | ||
17/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/05/1954. Dep: 26/05/1954. | ||
07/02/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 07/02/1955. Dep: 26/03/1955. | ||
08/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1956. Dep: 01/09/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21124 (Diagram 3) |
||
21/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 21/08/1958. Dep: 19/09/1958. | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
29/07/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61794 from Eastfield (65A) |