|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/10/1922 | 10/02/1923 | 118 days | Heavy | After collision |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1925 | 13/06/1925 | 108 days | General | Altered to NB gauge Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4703 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 07/1927 | 29/10/1927 | General | Boiler number 7254 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1932 | 01/1932 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 10/1933 | General | Side window cab fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 23/02/1935 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 03/1935 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 06/1935 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 13/07/1936 | General | Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 06/11/1937 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 30/01/1937 | 20/02/1937 | 22 days | Heavy Casual | Boiler number 7615 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 10/03/1939 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 15/07/1939 | Light Repair | Hudd A.T.C. part fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 20/03/1941 | General | Hudd completed |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 14/01/1943 | General | Hudd removed |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 23/12/1944 | General | Boiler number 7620 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 23/11/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 18/03/1947 | 03/07/1947 | 108 days | General | Boiler number 21159 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1948 | 02/1948 | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 16/05/1949 | 18/06/1949 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61793 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1950 | 12/1950 | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 08/08/1950 | 16/09/1950 | 40 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 12/11/1951 | 12/01/1952 | 62 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/02/1953 | 28/02/1953 | 20 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/11/1954 | 18/12/1954 | 34 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/08/1956 | 24/08/1956 | 8 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/03/1957 | 20/04/1957 | 41 days | General | Boiler number 21173 (Diagram 3) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1703 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5353 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
16/10/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/10/1922. Dep: 10/02/1923. Work undertaken: After collision |
||
25/11/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
05/01/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
26/02/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1925. Dep: 13/06/1925. Work undertaken: Altered to NB gauge Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4703 |
||
03/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
12/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
07/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/07/1927. Dep: 29/10/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7254 (Diagram 3) |
||
1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1932. Dep: ?/01/1932. | ||
07/01/1932 | Modification | Diagram 3 number 7618 boiler fitted | ||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: ?/10/1933. Work undertaken: Side window cab fitted |
||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 23/02/1935. | ||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: ?/03/1935. | ||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: ?/06/1935. | ||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: 13/07/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21128 (Diagram 3) |
||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. | ||
30/01/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1937. Dep: 20/02/1937. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7615 (Diagram 3) |
||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 10/03/1939. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 15/07/1939. Work undertaken: Hudd A.T.C. part fitted |
||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 20/03/1941. Work undertaken: Hudd completed |
||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 14/01/1943. Work undertaken: Hudd removed |
||
24/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 23/12/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7620 (Diagram 3) |
||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 23/11/1945. | ||
03/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1793 | ||
18/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 18/03/1947. Dep: 03/07/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21159 (Diagram 3) |
||
1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1948. Dep: ?/02/1948. | ||
16/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 16/05/1949. Dep: 18/06/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61793 |
||
1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1950. Dep: ?/12/1950. | ||
08/08/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 08/08/1950. Dep: 16/09/1950. | ||
12/11/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1951. Dep: 12/01/1952. | ||
23/09/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
09/02/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 09/02/1953. Dep: 28/02/1953. | ||
07/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keith (61C) | ||
15/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/11/1954. Dep: 18/12/1954. | ||
17/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/08/1956. Dep: 24/08/1956. | ||
11/03/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1957. Dep: 20/04/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21173 (Diagram 3) |
||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
11/02/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61793 from Keith (61C) |