|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 25/02/1924 | 17/05/1924 | 83 days | General | Boiler number 7605 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4699 |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/01/1925 | 28/03/1925 | 61 days | Light Repair | Altered to NB gauge |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1930 | 01/11/1930 | General | Boiler number 7623 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1932 | 25/11/1932 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 02/06/1934 | General | Side window cab & drop grate fitted Boiler number C1825 (Diagram 3) Named LOCH LAIDON |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 30/05/1935 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/08/1936 | 24/09/1936 | 41 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 06/11/1937 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 10/12/1938 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 18/08/1939 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 15/12/1939 | Light Repair | Cab screens fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 02/03/1940 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 19/04/1941 | 17/05/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7615 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 29/04/1943 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 10/05/1943 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 31/03/1945 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 29/12/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/05/1946 | 29/06/1946 | 50 days | General | Boiler number 21176 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 25/04/1947 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/11/1947 | 24/01/1948 | 71 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1948 | 02/10/1948 | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61789 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1949 | 08/1949 | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 21/11/1950 | 29/12/1950 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 21157 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 22/04/1953 | 20/05/1953 | 29 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
20/07/1954 | 10/08/1954 | 22 days | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 10/08/1954 | 11/08/1954 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/04/1955 | 28/05/1955 | 33 days | General | Boiler number 21138 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 06/07/1955 | 07/07/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/12/1956 | 29/12/1956 | 26 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/03/1958 | 29/03/1958 | 24 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/02/1948 | Cowlairs Works | No engines have as yet (7/2) appeared from Cowlairs Works lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' or painted in any new style; the same remarks also apply to Q.P. Works. Further locomotives ex Cowlairs Works painted green are: Nos. 1787-89, 2679/80, while Nos. 2440/2, 9189, an 9215 were just ex Works, the latter having acquired the vacuum brake | SLS/194803 |
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1699 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5349 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
25/02/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/02/1924. Dep: 17/05/1924. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7605 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4699 |
||
27/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/01/1925. Dep: 28/03/1925. Work undertaken: Altered to NB gauge |
||
01/04/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1930. Dep: 01/11/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7623 (Diagram 3) |
||
1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1932. Dep: 25/11/1932. | ||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 02/06/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab & drop grate fitted Boiler number C1825 (Diagram 3) Named LOCH LAIDON |
||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 30/05/1935. | ||
15/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/08/1936. Dep: 24/09/1936. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 06/11/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 10/12/1938. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 15/12/1939. Work undertaken: Cab screens fitted |
||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 18/08/1939. | ||
07/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fort William (FW) | ||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. | ||
19/04/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/04/1941. Dep: 17/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7615 (Diagram 3) |
||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 29/04/1943. | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 10/05/1943. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 31/03/1945. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 29/12/1945. | ||
28/04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1789 | ||
11/05/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/05/1946. Dep: 29/06/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21176 (Diagram 3) |
||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 25/04/1947. | ||
15/11/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 15/11/1947. Dep: 24/01/1948. | ||
1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: ?/1948. Dep: 02/10/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61789 |
||
1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1949. Dep: ?/08/1949. | ||
21/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 21/11/1950. Dep: 29/12/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21157 (Diagram 3) |
||
01/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
22/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 22/04/1953. Dep: 20/05/1953. | ||
10/08/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 10/08/1954. Dep: 11/08/1954. | ||
26/04/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/04/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21138 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/07/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/07/1955. Dep: 07/07/1955. | ||
04/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 04/12/1956. Dep: 29/12/1956. | ||
06/03/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 06/03/1958. Dep: 29/03/1958. | ||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
30/09/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61789 from Eastfield (65A) |