|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 16/01/1924 | 12/07/1924 | 179 days | General | Altered to NB gauge |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/07/1924 | 02/08/1924 | 5 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4695 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1927 | 09/1927 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 03/1930 | 05/1930 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 20/05/1933 | General | Boiler number 7251 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 06/1934 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 30/01/1935 | General | Side window cab fitted & fog apparatus removed |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 07/03/1936 | 07/04/1936 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 04/1936 | 1 day | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 29/05/1937 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 12/1937 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 25/02/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 24/12/1938 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 06/01/1939 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 12/04/1939 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 11/01/1940 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 01/06/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 15 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 02/1942 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 24/10/1942 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 09/05/1942 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 05/02/1944 | General | Boiler number 21146 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 02/1944 | 12/02/1944 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 14/05/1945 | 14/06/1945 | 32 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/1945 | 27/06/1945 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 15/03/1947 | 17/04/1947 | 34 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/07/1948 | 03/12/1948 | 127 days | General | Boiler number 21130 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61785 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1949 | 03/1949 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 07/11/1950 | 14/12/1950 | 38 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/03/1952 | 10/05/1952 | 41 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 13/01/1954 | 13/02/1954 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21177 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 16/12/1954 | 08/01/1955 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/06/1955 | 15/07/1955 | 24 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 01/08/1955 | 03/09/1955 | 34 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/01/1957 | 16/02/1957 | 38 days | Light Intermediate | WRU gear removed |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1695 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5345 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
16/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/01/1924. Dep: 12/07/1924. Work undertaken: Altered to NB gauge |
||
29/07/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/07/1924. Dep: 02/08/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4695 |
||
22/12/1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1927. Dep: ?/09/1927. | ||
30/08/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/03/1930. Dep: ?/05/1930. | ||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: 20/05/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7251 (Diagram 3) |
||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: ?/06/1934. | ||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 30/01/1935. Work undertaken: Side window cab fitted & fog apparatus removed |
||
07/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/03/1936. Dep: 07/04/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7624 (Diagram 3) |
||
04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/04/1936. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 29/05/1937. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: ?/12/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 24/12/1938. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 25/02/1938. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 06/01/1939. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 12/04/1939. | ||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 11/01/1940. | ||
01/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/06/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: ?/02/1942. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 09/05/1942. | ||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 24/10/1942. | ||
10/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
07/12/1942 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
24/04/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 05/02/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21146 (Diagram 3) |
||
02/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/02/1944. Dep: 12/02/1944. | ||
14/05/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 14/05/1945. Dep: 14/06/1945. | ||
06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/06/1945. Dep: 27/06/1945. | ||
17/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1785 | ||
15/03/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 15/03/1947. Dep: 17/04/1947. | ||
30/07/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 30/07/1948. Dep: 03/12/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21130 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61785 |
||
1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1949. Dep: ?/03/1949. | ||
07/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 07/11/1950. Dep: 14/12/1950. | ||
31/03/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 31/03/1952. Dep: 10/05/1952. | ||
13/01/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 13/01/1954. Dep: 13/02/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21177 (Diagram 3) |
||
16/12/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 16/12/1954. Dep: 08/01/1955. | ||
22/06/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 22/06/1955. Dep: 15/07/1955. | ||
01/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/08/1955. Dep: 03/09/1955. | ||
10/01/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 10/01/1957. Dep: 16/02/1957. Work undertaken: WRU gear removed |
||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
23/04/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61785 from Eastfield (65A) |