|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1922 | 13/05/1922 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/02/1923 | 05/05/1923 | 83 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/12/1924 | 21/03/1925 | 107 days | General | Altered to NB gauge Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4692 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1931 | 18/04/1931 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 28/02/1933 | General | Cab side screens fitted Named LOCH EIL |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 11/07/1934 | General | Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 03/01/1936 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 09/1936 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 17/11/1937 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 07/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 23/12/1938 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 14/02/1939 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 10/02/1940 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 14/06/1941 | General | Hudd A.T.C. fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 06/11/1941 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 29/10/1943 | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 05/07/1944 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 11/06/1945 | 14/07/1945 | 34 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1946 | 28/04/1946 | Light Repair | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1782 |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 25/04/1947 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 16/06/1947 | 30/08/1947 | 76 days | Heavy | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/11/1948 | 28/01/1949 | 70 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61782 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 15/11/1950 | 16/12/1950 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1951 | 06/1951 | Light Casual | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 12/08/1952 | 19/09/1952 | 39 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 17/05/1955 | 25/06/1955 | 40 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/08/1958 | 13/09/1958 | 40 days | General | 21156 (ex61779) 13/9/58 |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
07/09/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Nos. 4852 an 4927 (both BLA) were observed here on 7/9, awaiting shops. Further locos. ex Works that have been noted here during September are: Nos. *1734/*1782, 1855, 2476/89, *2684/*2687, 2702, 4548, 4636, 4840/49, 4916/19/23/28, 5901/8/9/12, 7453/66, 7600, 8122, 8328, 8468/80, 9133, 9214/16 an 9564, whilst those observed on 1/10 were: *1732, 2455/73, 4578, 4865, 4922 an 9160 . *Painted green. On 11/10 'J83' No. 8474 was on shed, being ex Works and painted green. This engine now has a Gresham and Craven type 'P' solid jet ejector and an old (trigger) pattern steam brake valve. 'J37' No. 4546 has L.M.S. type water gauge frames with Dewrance protectors. | SLS/194711 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1692 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5342 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) |
||
01/05/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/05/1922. Dep: 13/05/1922. | ||
12/02/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/02/1923. Dep: 05/05/1923. | ||
05/12/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/12/1924. Dep: 21/03/1925. Work undertaken: Altered to NB gauge Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4692 |
||
27/03/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
15/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Margarets (STM) | ||
1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1931. Dep: 18/04/1931. | ||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: 28/02/1933. Work undertaken: Cab side screens fitted Named LOCH EIL |
||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 11/07/1934. Work undertaken: Side window cab & drop grate fitted |
||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: 03/01/1936. | ||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: ?/09/1936. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 17/11/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 23/12/1938. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: ?/07/1938. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 14/02/1939. | ||
07/10/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Fort William (FW) | ||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 10/02/1940. | ||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 14/06/1941. Work undertaken: Hudd A.T.C. fitted |
||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 06/11/1941. | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 29/10/1943. | ||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 05/07/1944. | ||
11/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1945. Dep: 14/07/1945. | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 28/04/1946. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 1782 |
||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 25/04/1947. | ||
16/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 16/06/1947. Dep: 30/08/1947. | ||
20/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/11/1948. Dep: 28/01/1949. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61782 |
||
15/11/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 15/11/1950. Dep: 16/12/1950. | ||
1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: ?/1951. Dep: ?/06/1951. | ||
06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
14/06/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) | ||
12/08/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 12/08/1952. Dep: 19/09/1952. | ||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) | ||
07/07/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Keith (61C) | ||
17/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 17/05/1955. Dep: 25/06/1955. | ||
05/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/08/1958. Dep: 13/09/1958. Work undertaken: 21156 (ex61779) 13/9/58 |
||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
13/06/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61782 from Keith (61C) |