|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1922 | 17/06/1922 | 6 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1924 | 26/04/1924 | 111 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4691 |
||
Doncaster Works | 07/01/1925 | 18/02/1925 | 43 days | Light Repair | Altered to NB gauge |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1932 | 09/1932 | Unknown Regime | Side window cab with short roof fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 25/08/1933 | General | Named LOCH MORAR |
|||
Doncaster Works | 11/01/1933 | 03/02/1933 | 24 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 16/03/1934 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 23/03/1935 | General | Side window cab (with 9" extension) & drop grate fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 06/1936 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 19/10/1937 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 13/05/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1939 | 02/09/1939 | General | Hudd A.T.C. fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 04/07/1940 | Light Repair | Hudd removed |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 28/12/1940 | General | Hudd fitted Boiler number 9153 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 10/05/1942 | Light Repair | Hudd removed |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 13/11/1943 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 27/01/1945 | General | Boiler number 21161 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 03/03/1945 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1946 | 09/02/1946 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1946 | 12/10/1946 | 42 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 29/06/1947 | 30/06/1947 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/03/1948 | 19/05/1948 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 21169 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61781 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/09/1949 | 29/10/1949 | 33 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 18/01/1951 | 17/02/1951 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/05/1952 | 06/06/1952 | 32 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 07/05/1954 | 15/06/1954 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 21131 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 08/11/1954 | 11/12/1954 | 34 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/09/1956 | 27/10/1956 | 37 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 11/09/1957 | 20/09/1957 | 10 days | Light Casual |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1691 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5341 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
12/06/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1922. Dep: 17/06/1922. | ||
07/01/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/01/1924. Dep: 26/04/1924. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4691 |
||
07/01/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/01/1925. Dep: 18/02/1925. Work undertaken: Altered to NB gauge |
||
23/02/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1932. Dep: ?/09/1932. Work undertaken: Side window cab with short roof fitted |
||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: 25/08/1933. Work undertaken: Named LOCH MORAR |
||
11/01/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/01/1933. Dep: 03/02/1933. | ||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 16/03/1934. | ||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935. Work undertaken: Side window cab (with 9" extension) & drop grate fitted |
||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: ?/06/1936. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: 19/10/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 13/05/1938. | ||
1939 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1939. Dep: 02/09/1939. Work undertaken: Hudd A.T.C. fitted |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 28/12/1940. Work undertaken: Hudd fitted Boiler number 9153 (Diagram 3) |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: 04/07/1940. Work undertaken: Hudd removed |
||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 10/05/1942. Work undertaken: Hudd removed |
||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 13/11/1943. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 27/01/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21161 (Diagram 3) |
||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 03/03/1945. | ||
1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1946. Dep: 09/02/1946. | ||
05/05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1781 | ||
01/09/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 01/09/1946. Dep: 12/10/1946. | ||
29/06/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/06/1947. Dep: 30/06/1947. | ||
20/03/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1948. Dep: 19/05/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21169 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61781 |
||
27/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1949. Dep: 29/10/1949. | ||
18/01/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/01/1951. Dep: 17/02/1951. | ||
06/05/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 06/05/1952. Dep: 06/06/1952. | ||
07/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 07/05/1954. Dep: 15/06/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21131 (Diagram 3) |
||
08/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 08/11/1954. Dep: 11/12/1954. | ||
21/09/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 21/09/1956. Dep: 27/10/1956. | ||
11/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 11/09/1957. Dep: 20/09/1957. | ||
12/12/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61781 from Eastfield (65A) | ||
1959 | Scrapped | Scrapped |