|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/12/1921 | 24/12/1921 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1923 | 25/08/1923 | 83 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/03/1925 | 30/05/1925 | 86 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4688 |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/11/1925 | 21/11/1925 | 18 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 18/02/1926 | 20/03/1926 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1927 | 01/12/1927 | 97 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/02/1928 | 17/03/1928 | 18 days | Light Repair | Westinghouse brake fitted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/10/1929 | 30/11/1929 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7466 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 11/06/1932 | 09/07/1932 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1935 | 13/04/1935 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 24/10/1936 | 21/11/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/07/1938 | 30/07/1938 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 21113 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1940 | 20/07/1940 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/01/1943 | 20/02/1943 | 29 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 04/03/1945 | 05/05/1945 | 63 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 16/10/1945 | 24/11/1945 | 40 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 26/08/1948 | 13/02/1948 | -194 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 08/11/1948 | 11/11/1948 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 30/10/1950 | 12/12/1950 | 44 days | Light Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61778 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/03/1953 | 02/05/1953 | 40 days | General | Boiler number 21184 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/08/1956 | 20/10/1956 | 56 days | Heavy Intermediate | Westinghouse Brake removed |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1688 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5338 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
20/12/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 20/12/1921. Dep: 24/12/1921. | ||
04/06/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/06/1923. Dep: 25/08/1923. | ||
06/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/03/1925. Dep: 30/05/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4688 |
||
28/08/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to York (North) (YK) | ||
04/11/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/11/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925. | ||
18/02/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/02/1926. Dep: 20/03/1926. | ||
02/04/1926 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
27/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 01/12/1927. | ||
29/02/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 29/02/1928. Dep: 17/03/1928. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake fitted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
17/03/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
19/10/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/10/1929. Dep: 30/11/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7466 (Diagram 3) |
||
21/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR) | ||
01/02/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
08/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR) | ||
15/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
11/06/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/06/1932. Dep: 09/07/1932. | ||
23/03/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1935. Dep: 13/04/1935. | ||
24/10/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 24/10/1936. Dep: 21/11/1936. | ||
02/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/07/1938. Dep: 30/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21113 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 20/07/1940. | ||
28/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
23/01/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/01/1943. Dep: 20/02/1943. | ||
04/03/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 04/03/1945. Dep: 05/05/1945. | ||
16/10/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 16/10/1945. Dep: 24/11/1945. | ||
12/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
09/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1778 | ||
21/02/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) | ||
25/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
13/02/1948 | Modification | Diagram 3 number 8861 boiler fitted | ||
26/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 26/08/1948. Dep: 13/02/1948. | ||
08/11/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 08/11/1948. Dep: 11/11/1948. | ||
30/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 30/10/1950. Dep: 12/12/1950. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61778 |
||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
24/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/03/1953. Dep: 02/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21184 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/03/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
24/04/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
26/08/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 26/08/1956. Dep: 20/10/1956. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
16/06/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
09/10/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61778 from Immingham (40B) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped |