|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/06/1921 | 25/06/1921 | 5 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 13/11/1922 | 25/11/1922 | 13 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 01/05/1923 | 11/08/1923 | 103 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 1685N |
||
Doncaster Works | 14/07/1925 | 10/10/1925 | 89 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 04/08/1927 | 03/11/1927 | 92 days | General | Boiler number 7267 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 15/06/1929 | 20/07/1929 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7455 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1930 | 25/10/1930 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 11/04/1931 | 18/04/1931 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1931 | 17/10/1931 | 50 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1932 | 1 day | Unknown Regime | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1933 | 12/1933 | General | Side window cab & drop grate fitted Named LOCH TREIG |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 07/12/1933 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 02/1934 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1934 | 29/10/1934 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 05/10/1935 | General | Boiler number 7623 (Diagram 3) |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1935 | 11/1935 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1936 | 09/11/1936 | Heavy | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1937 | 01/1937 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1938 | 08/06/1938 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 05/02/1938 | 11/03/1938 | 35 days | General | Boiler number 7613 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1940 | 02/1940 | General | Cab screens fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 15/08/1941 | General | Hudd A.T.C. fitted |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1941 | 20/12/1941 | Light Repair | Hudd removed |
|||
Cowlairs Works | 1942 | 02/05/1942 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1943 | 25/03/1943 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 19/06/1943 | 17/07/1943 | 29 days | Heavy | Boiler number 7470 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1944 | 07/02/1944 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 1945 | 17/03/1945 | General | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 06/10/1946 | 30/10/1946 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 8827 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 31/05/1947 | Unclassified | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 18/05/1948 | 02/07/1948 | 46 days | Heavy Intermediate | Renumbered to BR 61775 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1949 | 08/10/1949 | 38 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 24/08/1951 | 06/10/1951 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 21166 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 20/04/1953 | 20/05/1953 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 23/02/1954 | 27/03/1954 | 33 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/03/1955 | 14/05/1955 | 61 days | General | Boiler number 21160 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 25/05/1955 | 28/05/1955 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/12/1956 | 04/01/1957 | 31 days | Light Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (Erecting Shop) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
01/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. | SLS/194911 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1685 Built at Kitson, Works Number 5335 Allocated to Doncaster (DON) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
21/06/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/06/1921. Dep: 25/06/1921. | ||
13/11/1922 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 13/11/1922. Dep: 25/11/1922. | ||
01/05/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/05/1923. Dep: 11/08/1923. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 1685N |
||
05/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4685 | ||
14/07/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/07/1925. Dep: 10/10/1925. | ||
04/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/08/1927. Dep: 03/11/1927. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7267 (Diagram 3) |
||
15/06/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 15/06/1929. Dep: 20/07/1929. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7455 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/09/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/09/1930. Dep: 25/10/1930. | ||
11/04/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 11/04/1931. Dep: 18/04/1931. | ||
29/08/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1931. Dep: 17/10/1931. | ||
30/10/1931 | Allocation | Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD) | ||
1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unknown Regime) - Arr: ?/1932. | ||
1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1933. Dep: ?/12/1933. Work undertaken: Side window cab & drop grate fitted Named LOCH TREIG |
||
07/12/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 07/12/1933. | ||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: 29/10/1934. | ||
1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1934. Dep: ?/02/1934. | ||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: 05/10/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7623 (Diagram 3) |
||
1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1935. Dep: ?/11/1935. | ||
1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: ?/1936. Dep: 09/11/1936. | ||
1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1937. Dep: ?/01/1937. | ||
1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1938. Dep: 08/06/1938. | ||
05/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1938. Dep: 11/03/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7613 (Diagram 3) |
||
1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1940. Dep: ?/02/1940. Work undertaken: Cab screens fitted |
||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 15/08/1941. Work undertaken: Hudd A.T.C. fitted |
||
1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1941. Dep: 20/12/1941. Work undertaken: Hudd removed |
||
1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1942. Dep: 02/05/1942. | ||
1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1943. Dep: 25/03/1943. | ||
19/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy) - Arr: 19/06/1943. Dep: 17/07/1943. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7470 (Diagram 3) |
||
1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1944. Dep: 07/02/1944. | ||
1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: ?/1945. Dep: 17/03/1945. | ||
10/02/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1775 | ||
06/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 06/10/1946. Dep: 30/10/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8827 (Diagram 3) |
||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 31/05/1947. | ||
18/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 18/05/1948. Dep: 02/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61775 |
||
01/09/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 01/09/1949. Dep: 08/10/1949. | ||
24/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 24/08/1951. Dep: 06/10/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21166 (Diagram 3) |
||
20/04/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 20/04/1953. Dep: 20/05/1953. | ||
23/02/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/02/1954. Dep: 27/03/1954. | ||
15/03/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 15/03/1955. Dep: 14/05/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21160 (Diagram 3) |
||
25/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 25/05/1955. Dep: 28/05/1955. | ||
05/12/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/12/1956. Dep: 04/01/1957. | ||
1958 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
02/05/1958 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61775 from Eastfield (65A) |