|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 15/10/1921 | 05/11/1921 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 31/01/1923 | 16/05/1923 | 106 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 17/09/1925 | 28/11/1925 | 73 days | General | Boiler number 7255 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/11/1927 | 13/03/1928 | 123 days | General | Westinghouse brake fitted Boiler number 7611 (Diagram 3) Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/03/1930 | 19/04/1930 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7462 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/10/1933 | 25/11/1933 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7687 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 29/08/1936 | 03/10/1936 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/11/1938 | 03/12/1938 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/05/1941 | 31/05/1941 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1942 | 1 day | Light Repair | ||||
Doncaster Works | 18/04/1942 | 25/04/1942 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/09/1943 | 28/01/1944 | 131 days | General | Boiler number 8860 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/06/1945 | 19/07/1945 | 23 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/10/1946 | 16/02/1947 | 131 days | General | |||
Cowlairs Works | 1947 | 15/03/1947 | Light Repair | ||||
Cowlairs Works | 10/07/1949 | 22/09/1949 | 75 days | General | Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61759 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/09/1951 | 10/11/1951 | 45 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 21/12/1951 | 01/04/1952 | 103 days | Light Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 06/04/1952 | 09/04/1952 | 4 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 22/05/1954 | 16/07/1954 | 56 days | General | Boiler number 21153 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 01/09/1955 | 13/10/1955 | 43 days | Unclassified |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/08/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 1/8 to 27/8: These included Nos. 60502/05, 61081, 61727, 1729, 61736/46, 1753, 61759/83/91, 1823, 61876/78, 61988/93, 2428, 62683, 2687, 62688, 3180, 4546/47/64/79, 4703, 64855, 4945/86, 65913, 67478, 68113, 8321, 8477, 68481, 8544, 68955, 69183, 69213, 77306, ex L.M.S. 40170, 44795, 45022, 45451, 54654. During W/E 20/8 Cowlairs started putting the crest on both passenger and goods tender engines which had received a general repair (not intermediate repair) and the following have been noted: Nos. 61308, 61766, 64700 an 90313; no tank engines have so far been noted with the crest-No. 68477 appeared in lined black, with British Railways on the tanks. | SLS/194910 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/1918 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1669 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21980 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
15/10/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/10/1921. Dep: 05/11/1921. | ||
31/01/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 31/01/1923. Dep: 16/05/1923. | ||
13/03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 4669 | ||
17/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 17/09/1925. Dep: 28/11/1925. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7255 (Diagram 3) |
||
12/11/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 12/11/1927. Dep: 13/03/1928. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake fitted Boiler number 7611 (Diagram 3) Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
22/02/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
22/03/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/03/1930. Dep: 19/04/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7462 (Diagram 3) |
||
21/10/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/10/1933. Dep: 25/11/1933. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7687 (Diagram 3) |
||
29/08/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 29/08/1936. Dep: 03/10/1936. | ||
05/11/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/11/1938. Dep: 03/12/1938. | ||
03/05/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/05/1941. Dep: 31/05/1941. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7686 (Diagram 3) |
||
28/11/1941 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
21/03/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 21/03/1942. | ||
18/04/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 18/04/1942. Dep: 25/04/1942. | ||
20/09/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/09/1943. Dep: 28/01/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8860 (Diagram 3) |
||
27/06/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/06/1945. Dep: 19/07/1945. | ||
12/01/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
24/08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1759 | ||
09/10/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/10/1946. Dep: 16/02/1947. | ||
07/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
28/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (COL) | ||
1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: ?/1947. Dep: 15/03/1947. | ||
25/09/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
10/07/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/07/1949. Dep: 22/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61759 |
||
27/09/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 27/09/1951. Dep: 10/11/1951. | ||
21/12/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 21/12/1951. Dep: 01/04/1952. | ||
06/04/1952 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 06/04/1952. Dep: 09/04/1952. | ||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (38A) | ||
22/05/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 22/05/1954. Dep: 16/07/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21153 (Diagram 3) |
||
26/06/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) | ||
01/09/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 01/09/1955. Dep: 13/10/1955. | ||
17/06/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
29/12/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
05/04/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
01/01/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61759 from New England (34E) |