|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1921 | 18/03/1922 | 137 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1924 | 14/03/1925 | 108 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4655 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1925 | 02/01/1926 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1926 | 26/03/1927 | 110 days | General | Altered to GE gauge Boiler number 7465 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/09/1927 | 15/10/1927 | 43 days | Light Repair | Westinghouse brake ftted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 06/07/1928 | 06/10/1928 | 93 days | General | Boiler number 7602 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/10/1930 | 22/11/1930 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/05/1933 | 10/06/1933 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1935 | 23/03/1935 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21118 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 26/06/1937 | 24/07/1937 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1940 | 02/03/1940 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 9197 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 23/11/1940 | 14/12/1940 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1942 | 10/10/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 9346 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 14/03/1944 | 29/04/1944 | 47 days | General | Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 17/08/1944 | 16/09/1944 | 31 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 15/12/1944 | 26/01/1945 | 43 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/02/1946 | 02/05/1946 | 87 days | General | Boiler number 9345 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/08/1947 | 07/11/1947 | 89 days | General | Boiler number 8981 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 09/05/1948 | 11/07/1948 | 64 days | Light Repair | Renumbered to BR 61745 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 12/02/1950 | 18/03/1950 | 35 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 10/08/1951 | 01/12/1951 | 114 days | General | Boiler number 21138 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/11/1954 | 25/12/1954 | 37 days | General | Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 11/01/1955 | 29/01/1955 | 19 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 19/09/1957 | 19/10/1957 | 31 days | Heavy Intermediate |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/01/1943 | Doncaster Notes (engines lettered 'NE') | No. 2005, converted to Class 'A,' was due out 16/1. Another 'Q.4' 5048 is on hand for conversion to 'Q.1.' Other arrivals for works are 3838, 3465 an 4993. Streamlined 'B.17' 2870 has left works after a 'general,' also 'J.55' 3859 (BFD). Following on the previous list of engines lettered 'NE' at Plant:- October: 2957, 4474, 1125, 4513, 180, 4003, 4663, 4340, 3488, 4266, 2572, 4655, 3497, 1158, 1367, 4471, 1312, 4312, 3350, 4601, 1141, 4377, 2598, 4490, 2859, 2555, 2461, 483, 3076, 4637, 590, 2766, 4834, 4664, 1118, 4888, 2394, 3224, 4594, 4462, November: 3476, 2439, 4871, 4594, 4646, 4008, 2960, 601, 4053, 4805, 2426, 118, 135, 2563, 112, 1300, 4035, 4449, 4246, 4884, 2744, 4843, 3298, 2417, 5961, 178, 4495, 608, 2958, 2579, 2453, 3050, 125, 114, 4853, 3500, 3494, 2593, 3167. December: 3821, 4497, 4414, 4426, 3276, 4824, 586, 4545, 3621, 4018, 4225, 587, 3275 4793, 2546, 4456, 3819, 4851, 4316, 3631, 3819, 599, 3010, 3593, 17, 3387, 6139, 3498, 1156, 2870, 4240, 2955, 3232, 3047. | SLS/194302 |
30/11/1947 | Eastfield MPD | Further locos. ex Cowlairs Works that have been noted here during November were: Nos. 1728/45, 1764/6 (green, with 1766 snowplough fitted), 2406/31/64/75, 4574, 4605/39, 4817, 4932, 5924, 7465, 8096, 8471, 8957, 9144/62/73. | SLS/194801 |
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (yard) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1916 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1655 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1471 Allocated to Kings Cross (KX) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
02/11/1921 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/11/1921. Dep: 18/03/1922. | ||
27/11/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1924. Dep: 14/03/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4655 |
||
29/10/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
03/12/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/12/1925. Dep: 02/01/1926. | ||
07/12/1926 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1926. Dep: 26/03/1927. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge Boiler number 7465 (Diagram 3) |
||
03/09/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/09/1927. Dep: 15/10/1927. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake ftted Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
20/10/1927 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM) | ||
12/01/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
06/07/1928 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/07/1928. Dep: 06/10/1928. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7602 (Diagram 3) |
||
10/10/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) | ||
31/12/1928 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
03/03/1930 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
18/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/10/1930. Dep: 22/11/1930. | ||
06/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 06/05/1933. Dep: 10/06/1933. | ||
16/02/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1935. Dep: 23/03/1935. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21118 (Diagram 3) |
||
17/10/1935 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
26/06/1937 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/06/1937. Dep: 24/07/1937. | ||
05/11/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
10/12/1939 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
03/02/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/02/1940. Dep: 02/03/1940. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9197 (Diagram 3) |
||
23/11/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/11/1940. Dep: 14/12/1940. | ||
05/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1942. Dep: 10/10/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9346 (Diagram 3) |
||
14/03/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 14/03/1944. Dep: 29/04/1944. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21142 (Diagram 3) |
||
25/05/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
17/08/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 17/08/1944. Dep: 16/09/1944. | ||
15/12/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 15/12/1944. Dep: 26/01/1945. | ||
05/02/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/02/1946. Dep: 02/05/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9345 (Diagram 3) |
||
06/12/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
29/12/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1745 | ||
26/03/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW) | ||
11/08/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 11/08/1947. Dep: 07/11/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8981 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
09/05/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 09/05/1948. Dep: 11/07/1948. Work undertaken: Renumbered to BR 61745 |
||
12/02/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 12/02/1950. Dep: 18/03/1950. | ||
10/08/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 10/08/1951. Dep: 01/12/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21138 (Diagram 3) |
||
05/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
15/03/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
10/1954 | Modification | Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed | ||
19/11/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/11/1954. Dep: 25/12/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21162 (Diagram 3) |
||
11/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 11/01/1955. Dep: 29/01/1955. | ||
19/09/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 19/09/1957. Dep: 19/10/1957. | ||
01/03/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
1960 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
25/11/1960 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61745 from Immingham (40B) |