|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/03/1921 | 15/08/1921 | 165 days | General | ||||
Doncaster Works | 11/03/1924 | 09/08/1924 | 152 days | General | Altered to GE gauge Boiler number 7685 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4652 |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/04/1927 | 23/07/1927 | 102 days | General | Westinghouse brake fitted Boiler number 7550 (Diagram 3) Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/02/1929 | 27/04/1929 | 71 days | General | |||
Stratford Works | 01/10/1930 | 17/12/1930 | 78 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 19/03/1932 | 30/04/1932 | 43 days | General | Boiler number 7456 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/05/1933 | 08/07/1933 | 50 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/02/1934 | 24/03/1934 | 50 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/12/1935 | 11/01/1936 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 21129 (Diagram 3) |
||
Stratford Works | 26/03/1936 | 06/04/1936 | 12 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 26/02/1938 | 02/04/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8843 (Diagram 3) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/06/1938 | 18/06/1938 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 22/02/1941 | 22/03/1941 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 29/03/1941 | 04/04/1941 | 7 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1943 | 10/04/1943 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 12/06/1943 | 17/07/1943 | 36 days | Light Repair | |||
Stratford Works | 19/06/1944 | 27/07/1944 | 39 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 09/09/1945 | 20/10/1945 | 42 days | General | Boiler number 21139 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 19/02/1947 | 22/05/1947 | 93 days | General | Boiler number 21l52 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 26/10/1947 | 08/11/1947 | 14 days | Light Repair | |||
Cowlairs Works | 31/05/1949 | 02/09/1949 | 95 days | General | Boiler number 21188 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61742 |
||
Cowlairs Works | 27/01/1950 | 25/02/1950 | 30 days | Heavy Casual | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/03/1950 | 09/03/1950 | 5 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 05/07/1951 | 23/08/1951 | 50 days | Light Intermediate | |||
Cowlairs Works | 27/03/1953 | 09/05/1953 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 21185 (Diagram 3) |
||
Cowlairs Works | 24/05/1955 | 24/07/1955 | 62 days | Heavy Intermediate | Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
Cowlairs Works | 03/08/1955 | 04/08/1955 | 2 days | Unclassified | |||
Cowlairs Works | 20/08/1958 | 20/09/1958 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 21176 (Diagram 3) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
05/06/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. | SLS/194907 |
28/02/1950 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. | SLS/195004 |
29/01/1961 | New England | 60506/8 were in steam on SLS Visit on 29/1/61- 60504 was withdrawn 17/1/61. K2 61742 (from Boston) has replaced 61763 as stationary boiler. In store are L1s 67717/8/21/32/8 for LMR Gorton, and 67778/95/6/8 ex LMR Gorton. | SLS/196103 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1907 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR) | ||
05/1916 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 1652 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1469 Allocated to Ardsley (ARD) Diagram 3 boiler fitted |
||
1924 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
11/03/1924 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 11/03/1924. Dep: 09/08/1924. Work undertaken: Altered to GE gauge Boiler number 7685 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 4652 |
||
13/06/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
01/07/1925 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
13/04/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/04/1927. Dep: 23/07/1927. Work undertaken: Westinghouse brake fitted Boiler number 7550 (Diagram 3) Westinghouse Brake fitted |
||
16/02/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/02/1929. Dep: 27/04/1929. | ||
30/11/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
14/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Southend Victoria (STR) | ||
21/12/1929 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
01/10/1930 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 01/10/1930. Dep: 17/12/1930. | ||
19/03/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/03/1932. Dep: 30/04/1932. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7456 (Diagram 3) |
||
20/05/1933 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/05/1933. Dep: 08/07/1933. | ||
03/02/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 03/02/1934. Dep: 24/03/1934. | ||
07/12/1935 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/12/1935. Dep: 11/01/1936. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21129 (Diagram 3) |
||
26/03/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/03/1936. Dep: 06/04/1936. | ||
26/02/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 26/02/1938. Dep: 02/04/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8843 (Diagram 3) |
||
04/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 04/06/1938. Dep: 18/06/1938. | ||
26/02/1940 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (MAR) | ||
22/02/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/02/1941. Dep: 22/03/1941. | ||
29/03/1941 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 29/03/1941. Dep: 04/04/1941. | ||
20/03/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1943. Dep: 10/04/1943. | ||
12/06/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 12/06/1943. Dep: 17/07/1943. | ||
19/06/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Stratford Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 19/06/1944. Dep: 27/07/1944. | ||
09/09/1945 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 09/09/1945. Dep: 20/10/1945. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21139 (Diagram 3) |
||
24/03/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 1742 | ||
19/02/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 19/02/1947. Dep: 22/05/1947. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21l52 (Diagram 3) |
||
22/06/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR) | ||
17/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (STR) | ||
26/10/1947 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 26/10/1947. Dep: 08/11/1947. | ||
26/11/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to South Lynn (SL) | ||
31/05/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 31/05/1949. Dep: 02/09/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21188 (Diagram 3) Renumbered to BR 61742 |
||
27/01/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 27/01/1950. Dep: 25/02/1950. | ||
05/03/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 05/03/1950. Dep: 09/03/1950. | ||
05/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Intermediate) - Arr: 05/07/1951. Dep: 23/08/1951. | ||
26/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
01/11/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to March (31B) | ||
27/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1953. Dep: 09/05/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21185 (Diagram 3) |
||
13/09/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Lincoln (40A) | ||
10/10/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Immingham (40B) | ||
07/11/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (40F) | ||
24/05/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 24/05/1955. Dep: 24/07/1955. Work undertaken: Westinghouse Brake removed |
||
03/08/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 03/08/1955. Dep: 04/08/1955. | ||
20/08/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (General) - Arr: 20/08/1958. Dep: 20/09/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21176 (Diagram 3) |
||
08/01/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (34E) | ||
1962 | Scrapped | Scrapped | ||
15/05/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 61742 from New England (34E) |